Trustees TAVY DIVISION GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1143804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Warne | Chair | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Peers | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Johnson | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Parish | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Barlow | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Brunsdon | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Wing | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Pattenden | Trustee | 09 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Maczugowska | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Natasha Pridham | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAY HARRISON | Trustee | 14 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Frederica Olver | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUE DAVIES | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.