Accounts and annual returns DRAMA ASSOCIATION OF WALES - CYMDEITHAS DDRAMA CYMRU

Charity number: 502186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 May 2021 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 May 2021 459 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required