Financial history DRAMA ASSOCIATION OF WALES - CYMDEITHAS DDRAMA CYMRU

Charity number: 502186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £21.36k £11.42k £11.29k £10.28k £319
Total expenditure £25.65k £6.62k £16.12k £9.75k £719
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A