Financial history KEREN HABINYAN LIMITED

Charity number: 1144177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £24.00k £25.00k £23.61k £18.10k £60.00k
Total expenditure £1.69k £20.84k £13 £1.27k £60.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A