THE ORMEROD HOME TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 502203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 May 2020 06 May 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 07 May 2019 10 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 May 2019 18 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 November 2016 On time Download