THE ORMEROD HOME TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 502203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 07/05/2019 07/05/2020
Total gross income £5.14m £5.33m £5.52m £6.05m £0
Total expenditure £5.03m £5.01m £5.15m £6.86m £0
Income from government contracts £4.99m £0 N/A £5.48m N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £26.94k £5.22k £4.04k £3.32k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £523.71k £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £5.09m £4.78m £5.51m £6.04m N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £846 £1.04k £750 £2.90k N/A
Income - Other £19.02k £22.17k £14.35k £8.86k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.46m £5.01m £5.15m £6.86m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £7.23k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.78k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £568.92k £0 £0 £0 N/A