THE ASSOCIATION OF PROFESSIONAL SRI LANKANS IN THE UK (APSL)

Charity number: 1145786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required