THE ASSOCIATION OF PROFESSIONAL SRI LANKANS IN THE UK (APSL)

Charity number: 1145786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £19.07k £20.29k £27.83k £27.51k £132.03k
Total expenditure £13.79k £22.38k £24.85k £17.54k £60.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A