Financial history WYCOMBE TAMIL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1147539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £156.25k £132.76k £112.98k £118.79k £123.94k
Total expenditure £56.22k £100.54k £110.00k £138.82k £89.19k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £16.27k