THE SURVIVORS' NETWORK LIMITED

Charity number: 1144878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £581.90k £554.11k £650.52k £727.07k £1.21m
Total expenditure £488.48k £568.94k £610.23k £633.13k £1.09m
Income from government contracts £176.74k £221.29k £97.50k £97.50k £97.50k
Income from government grants £105.00k £104.42k £91.10k £16.79k £6.10k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.23k £7.93k £14.21k £21.78k £344.48k
Income - Other trading activities £209 £0 £51 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £571.32k £546.13k £636.27k £705.26k £860.60k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £118 £0 £0 £32 £0
Income - Other £23 £47 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £483.48k £563.94k £610.23k £633.13k £1.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.00k £5.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £850 £15.78k £0 £650 £3.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0