Trustees THE SURVIVORS' NETWORK LIMITED
Charity number: 1144878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Gibson | Chair | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Louise Mist | Trustee | 05 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shalini Nair | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Leanne Stone | Trustee | 23 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caryn Ann Swart | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Elliker | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Parsonage | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Trisha Lee Brandon | Trustee | 25 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.