Trustees ORPHANS IN NEED

Charity number: 1144812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lucy Marie Bansal Trustee 28 November 2022
None on record
Asif Mohammad Trustee 23 March 2016
None on record
Dr Shoukat Ali Trustee 08 January 2015
None on record
Valerie Scarll Trustee 26 February 2014
None on record
ANISH MUSA Trustee 04 October 2011
None on record
ISMAIL VANIA Trustee 04 October 2011
None on record