ST STEPHENS CP SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1144421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 July 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 22 July 2019 26 May 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 22 July 2018 25 June 2019 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 22 July 2017 11 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 22 July 2016 25 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2016 Not Required