ST STEPHENS CP SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1144421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 22/07/2016 22/07/2017 22/07/2018 22/07/2019 22/07/2020
Total gross income £4.95k £3.51k £4.77k £5.55k £1.80k
Total expenditure £6.97k £3.50k £2.44k £3.32k £3.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A