XTEND GLOBAL

Charity number: 1144658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.12m £1.18m £1.32m £1.32m £1.31m
Total expenditure £843.81k £1.10m £1.05m £1.18m £1.30m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £992.74k £1.02m £1.22m £1.23m £1.26m
Income - Other trading activities £124.84k £163.24k £97.41k £90.66k £48.96k
Income - Charitable activities £4.21k £1.86k £1.99k £1.78k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22 £123 £42 £909 £1.22k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £34.55k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £795.14k £1.04m £952.61k £1.06m £1.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £54.38k £97.42k £116.67k £166.64k
Expenditure - Governance £7.73k £21.22k £39.16k £40.58k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £30.00k £0 £267 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0