XTEND GLOBAL

Charity number: 1144658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Walter Alexander Jones Trustee 17 February 2015 None on record
JONATHAN GRAHAM BLACK BMath MBA Chair 14 November 2011 None on record
Mark Graham Billage Trustee 18 April 2020
F G CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
CHI-CHUNG KEUNG Trustee 11 September 2013 None on record
Ghaida Ilia Azeez Trustee 24 October 2019 None on record
HUGO WOLMARANS Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record