LINCS ARK (ANIMAL WELFARE)

Charity number: 1146290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 April 2017 On time Download