LINCS ARK (ANIMAL WELFARE)

Charity number: 1146290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £27.83k £34.71k £33.40k £43.83k £48.72k
Total expenditure £33.18k £28.38k £41.98k £39.77k £33.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A