ISLE OF WIGHT FOODBANK

Charity number: 1144644
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 11 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 02 September 2021 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 27 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 19 September 2019 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 19 September 2019 19 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 06 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 06 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 07 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 August 2017 On time Download