COVENTRY BANGLADESH CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1145895
Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 307 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 307 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required