COVENTRY BANGLADESH CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1145895
Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £10.00k £17.34k £13.45k
Total expenditure £42.88k £34.88k £35.21k £22.29k £12.57k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A