Accounts and annual returns AL MAJIDIAH TRUST
Charity number: 1147811

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 13 October 2021 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2019 | 24 February 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2018 | 24 February 2020 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2017 | 11 February 2020 | 591 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2017 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window