JINO ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1148506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 February 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 May 2018 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required