JINO ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1148506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.95k £8.75k £9.58k £9.75k £9.95k