ZUMURATU-LI-MUMEEN ASSOCIATION MANCHESTER UK

Charity number: 1145231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 May 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 11 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 10 July 2019 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 05 June 2017 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required