LUTON RIGHTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1146500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £365.17k £227.91k £172.52k £188.54k £161.75k
Total expenditure £354.82k £233.08k £166.40k £172.21k £169.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £7.07k N/A
Income from government grants £14.25k £175.10k £6.28k N/A N/A