LUTON RIGHTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1146500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 June 2020 124 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 March 2018 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 March 2018 47 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time Download