Accounts and annual returns WHITE ROCK ROSE LIMITED

Charity number: 1145186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 May 2021 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 November 2019 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 November 2019 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window