ASPIRE HIGHER ACADEMY LIMITED

Charity number: 1152806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 12 January 2020 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 24 September 2018 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 01 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required