ASPIRE HIGHER ACADEMY LIMITED

Charity number: 1152806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £9.99k £10.00k £10.00k £11.00k £10.00k
Total expenditure £9.00k £9.57k £9.57k £11.01k £9.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A