Financial history LAURA KINSELLA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1145325
Charity reporting is overdue by 68 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £70.57k £64.68k £49.17k £33.85k £26.87k
Total expenditure £271.96k £320.57k £335.01k £283.09k £272.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A