Accounts and annual returns THE CHRISTIAN RESTORATION MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1146061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required