Financial history THE CHRISTIAN RESTORATION MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1146061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.00k £2.50k £3.00k £3.38k £4.00k
Total expenditure £2.65k £2.00k £2.40k £2.94k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A