CANBURY PARK CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1146287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 22/09/2016 22/09/2017 22/09/2018 22/09/2019 22/09/2020
Total gross income £60.94k £508.08k £303.43k £77.43k £69.96k
Total expenditure £72.68k £86.10k £98.12k £163.57k £89.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £491.26k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £16.81k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £43.09k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £43.02k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A