Accounts and annual returns LONDON ACADEMY FOR LEARNING

Charity number: 1147655
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 09 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 09 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 18 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 28 May 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 28 May 2021 58 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window