Financial history LONDON ACADEMY FOR LEARNING

Charity number: 1147655
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £242.07k £244.87k £214.95k £165.18k £293.32k
Total expenditure £234.74k £244.35k £231.12k £183.19k £301.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £9.92k N/A N/A