Financial history BACKSTAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1145887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £3.50m £2.23m £2.19m £4.20m £4.47m
Total expenditure £2.67m £2.68m £2.10m £3.75m £4.14m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.48m £2.20m £2.18m £4.20m £4.47m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £3.48m £0 £0 £0 £4.47m
Income - Investment £14.14k £28.09k £8.56k £8.45k £4.21k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.67m £2.68m £2.10m £3.75m £4.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £41.67k £64.47k £9.10k £9.35k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.63m £2.62m £0 £3.66m £4.14m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0