ZIAIA WELFARE

Charity number: 1146340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 August 2018 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 14 August 2017 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required