Accounts and annual returns MIDLANDS HOSPITALS' CHOIR

Charity number: 1149642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window