Financial history MIDLANDS HOSPITALS' CHOIR

Charity number: 1149642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £34.73k £26.75k £23.63k £23.38k £22.36k
Total expenditure £36.57k £24.23k £22.42k £24.75k £22.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A