BURGESS HILL YOUTH

Charity number: 1149304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £30.06k £40.01k £15.99k £21.71k £24.98k
Total expenditure £26.67k £43.40k £16.06k £19.92k £27.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £19.71k N/A N/A N/A