CARERS ANONYMOUS ANIMAL REFUGE SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1147495
Charity reporting is overdue by 389 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 24 days
Accounts and TAR 08 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 24 days
Annual return 08 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 389 days
Accounts and TAR 08 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 389 days
Annual return 08 January 2019 26 May 2020 200 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 January 2019 26 May 2020 200 days late Download
Annual return 08 January 2018 12 November 2018 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 January 2018 08 April 2019 151 days late Download
Annual return 08 January 2017 04 December 2017 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 January 2017 04 December 2017 26 days late Download