CARERS ANONYMOUS ANIMAL REFUGE SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1147495
Charity reporting is overdue by 390 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 08/01/2015 08/01/2016 08/01/2017 08/01/2018 08/01/2019
Total gross income £48.00k £44.71k £50.19k £59.51k £42.36k
Total expenditure £43.33k £43.01k £50.66k £52.13k £44.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A