Financial history MIDAYE SOMALI DEVELOPMENT NETWORK

Charity number: 1148304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £373.08k £665.04k £531.22k £493.40k £721.88k
Total expenditure £378.11k £538.21k £539.71k £549.83k £636.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £105.21k £142.35k £28.00k
Income from government grants £59.13k £336.59k £120.74k £80.53k £222.90k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A £745
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £664.94k £531.03k N/A £721.06k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £93 £188 N/A £72
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £538.21k £539.71k N/A £606.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 N/A £30.38k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £8.93k £5.99k N/A £5.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A £0