Governing document BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR SEXUAL HEALTH AND HIV
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 SEP 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/03/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 OCT 2017 as amended on 17 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND IMPROVE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF DIAGNOSING, TREATING AND MANAGING SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED INFECTIONS, HIV AND OTHER SEXUAL HEALTH PROBLEMS. 2 TO INNOVATE AND DELIVER EXCELLENT TAILORED EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS, TRAINERS AND TRAINEES IN THE UK. 3 TO DETERMINE, MONITOR AND MAINTAIN STANDARDS OF GOVERNANCE IN THE PROVISION OF SEXUAL HEALTH AND HIV CARE. 4 TO ADVANCE PUBLIC HEALTH IN RELATION TO SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED INFECTIONS, HIV AND OTHER SEXUAL HEALTH PROBLEMS. 5 TO CHAMPION AND PROMOTE GOOD SEXUAL HEALTH AND PROVIDE EDUCATION TO THE PUBLIC.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.