Trustees BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR SEXUAL HEALTH AND HIV
Charity number: 1148196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Kajal Verma | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Evans-Jones | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Oliver | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hasan Mohammed | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cara Saxon | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Anderson | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katarina Prime | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Rayment | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Crossman | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lindsay Henderson | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Ward | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Matthew David Phillips | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophia Brady | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rona Elaine MacDonald | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hubert Ansell Clarke | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Christopher Stuart Grundy-Bowers | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Claudia Estcourt | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Phillips | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Dewsnap | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.