TRAUMA FOUNDATION SOUTH WEST

Charity number: 1146885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 22 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 26 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 26 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 10 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 10 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 28 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 28 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 02 February 2018 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 02 February 2018 36 days late Download