TRAUMA FOUNDATION SOUTH WEST

Charity number: 1146885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £53.39k £53.39k £86.62k £91.75k £65.72k
Total expenditure £63.83k £63.83k £91.51k £76.74k £68.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A