CHRIST THE ROCK WORSHIP CENTRE

Charity number: 1148042
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 15 December 2016 24 April 2018 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 04 February 2017 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)