CHRIST THE ROCK WORSHIP CENTRE

Charity number: 1148042
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 15/12/2016 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £23.05k £19.09k £16.14k £20.43k £17.10k
Total expenditure £23.03k £20.58k £16.13k £20.29k £17.66k